__.__.2008 -
|
delivered to CBRail S.ŕ r.l., Luxembourg [L]
"311D-16" |
__.__.2008 -
|
in service
|
|
__.__.2008 - __.__.2009
hired to PCC Rail S.A., Jaworzno [PL]
"311D-16" |
|
09.11.2009 - __.02.2011
=> DB Schenker Rail Polska S.A., Jaworzno [PL]
"311D-16" [NVR: "92 51 3640 024-7 PL-DBSRP"] |
|
__.02.2011 - 28.04.2016
=> DB Schenker Rail Polska S.A., Zabrze [PL]
"311D-16" [NVR: "92 51 3640 024-7 PL-DBSRP"] |
04.01.2013 -
|
=> Macquarie European Rail Limited (Luxembourg Branch), Luxemburg [L]
"311D-16" |
|
__.__.2014 - __.__.2014
subhired to ZIK - Zakład Inżynierii Kolejowej Sp. j., Sandomierz [PL]
"311D-16" |
|
12.11.2014 - __.08.2015
subhired to Landkol Sp. z o.o., Świdnica [PL]
"311D-16" |
|
__.08.2015 - 30.12.2015
=> OT Rail Sp. z o.o., Świdnica [PL]
"311D-16" [Umfirmierung des Untermieters] |
|
29.04.2016 - __.05.2018
=> DB Cargo Polska S.A., Zabrze [PL]
"311D-16" [changed name of the lessee] |
|
__.__.2017 - __.05.2018
subhired to ZIK - Zakład Inżynierii Kolejowej Sp. j., Sandomierz [PL]
"311D-16" |
|
02.07.2018 - 17.08.2018
hired to PKP Cargo S.A., Warszawa [PL]
"311D-16" |
|
18.01.2019 - 03.10.2023
hired to PKP Cargo S.A., Warszawa [PL]
"311D-16" |
23.04.2020 -
|
sold to AKIEM SAS, Saint-Ouen [F]
"311D-16" |
|
18.10.2023 -
hired to Alza Cargo sp. z o.o., Katowice [PL]
"311D-16" [NVR: "92 51 3640 024-7 PL-ALZ"] |